Kanerva, Kevin Jay (CPSO#: 57246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 421
9-3151 Lake Shore Road
Kelowna BC  V1W 3S9
Phone: (250) 212-4899
Fax: (888) 370-2033
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

346 Lawrence Ave
Suite 101
Kelowna BC  V1Y 6L4
Canada
Phone: 250-212-4899
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN JAY KANERVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANERVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987