Kang, Amrit Kaur (CPSO#: 70356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
West Wing, Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6227
Fax: (416) 530-6233
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amrit Kang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kang ( CPSO# 70356 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building West Wing
Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6227

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2000