Kang, Angela Margaret (CPSO#: 58278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 490
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-2667
Fax: 416-492-6189
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Kang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kang ( CPSO# 58278 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Suite 490
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 492-2667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARGARET KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988