Kang, Han Sol (CPSO#: 96444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Han Sol Kang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kang ( CPSO# 96444 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAN SOL KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013