Kang, Parmjit Singh (CPSO#: 61552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: Bahga, Parmjit Singh (used until: 01 Jan 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Jabalpur University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 216-7110-120th Street
Surrey
Surrey BC  V3W 3M8
Phone: (604) 590-7121
Fax: (604) 590-7155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARMJIT SINGH KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991