Kang, Sang Sul (CPSO#: 22529)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kyungpook National University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994