Kang, Xian (CPSO#: 91185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Digestive Health Clinic
Suite 510-330 Hwy #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xian Kang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Kang ( CPSO# 91185 )

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 East
5th Floor
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XIAN KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014