Kanhai, Denis Vibart (CPSO#: 27499)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Kanhai's medical records remained with each of the clinics he worked at: The Doctor's Office (Formerly MedCare) Tel: (416) 635-7175 Yorkwoods Medical Centre: 2867 Jane Street Tel: (416) 398-9555
Date Received: 16 Aug 2011

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1975
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1998
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 19 Apr 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Nov 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Nov 2010
Summary:

 On Monday, November 29, 2010, the Discipline Committee, upon reading the Agreed Statement of Facts 
 and Admission, and the undertaking of Dr. Kanhai dated October 27, 2010 never to practise medicine 
 in any jurisdiction, found that Dr. Kanhai has committed an act of professional misconduct, in 
 that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and 
 that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

The findings relate to 
 two separate incidents, the first in 2003 and the second a criminal conviction in 2007. On August 
 20, 2003, a 13yearold patient and her mother attended on Dr. Kanhai for suture removal.  After 
 removing the sutures, Dr. Kanhai performed a medically unnecessary breast examination on the 
 patient, which failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession. On August 16, 2006, a 
 patient attended at Dr. Kanhai's medical clinic for the purpose of having a physician sign her 
 diet forms in support of her claim for a diet allowance. Without consent or medical justification, 
 Dr. Kanhai put his hand down her bra and manipulated her breast and nipple. On or about November 
 9, 2007, Dr. Kanhai was found guilty of one count of sexual assault contrary to the Criminal Code 
 in relation to this incident. 

In light of his resignation and undertaking to never practise 
 medicine again in any jurisdiction, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. 
 Kanhai pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this 
 Order; and,

2.	The results of this proceeding to be included on the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Monday, November 29, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Apr 1982
Summary:

 In April 1982, the Discipline Committee heard two separate sets of allegations against Dr. Kanhai, 
 which were dealt with together in one Discipline Hearing.  In each of the two Notices of Hearing 
 Dr. Kanhai was alleged to be guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 
 577/75, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, 
 contrary to s. 26(20); and in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, dispense or 
 sell a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, 
 contrary to s. 26(25).  In the second set of allegations, Dr. Kanhai was also alleged to be guilty 
 of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in 
 that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
 all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  The Committee found Dr. Kanhai guilty on all of these counts, and consequently 
 ordered that, with respect to the first set of allegations, his licence to practice be revoked.  
 With regard to the second set of allegations, the Committee ruled that Dr. Kanhai(s licence was to 
 be suspended for a period of three months, and it was further ordered that both of these penalties 
 be served concurrently.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Mar 1984
Hearing Date(s): Apr 19, 1982

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 14 Oct 1986
Decision: Application Accepted

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Denis Vibart Kanhai Johnson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Denis Vibart Kanhai:

2). Acknowledge that I was the subject of investigations under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigations”) by the College regarding whether I have committed acts of professional misconduct or am incompetent in the practice of medicine. I also acknowledge that allegations regarding acts of professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College.
3). Hereby resign from the College effective November 15, 2010 (the “Effective Date”).
4). Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
5). Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re-commence the Investigations it terminated as a result of this Undertaking, including proceeding with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.