Kanjee, Anjum Shabbir (CPSO#: 81312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10376 Yonge Street
unit 108
Richmond Hill ON  L4C3B8
Phone: (905) 918-1358
Fax: (905) 918-0392
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 McLevin Ave.
Muslim Welfare Centre of Toronto
Suite#4 & 4A Scarborough, ON M1B 5K
Scarborough ON  M1B 5K1
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-8116
Fax: (416) 754-4468
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kanjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kanjee ( CPSO# 81312 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Phone Number: (905) 918-1358

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJUM SHABBIR KANJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006