Kanjeekal, Santosh Samuel Rajh (CPSO#: 77291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Kanjeekal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kanjeekal ( CPSO# 77291 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANTOSH SAMUEL RAJH KANJEEKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANJEEKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2002 to 10 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003