Kanji, Amirali (CPSO#: 24394)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Sajad Zalzaia 1400 Provincial Road Windsor ON N8W 5W1 ph: 226 216 8966 fax: 888.655.7536
Instructions: Contact above.
Date Received: 15 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Mar 2013