Kanji, Zaheer Shamshudin (CPSO#: 97008)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 09 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015