Kanjo, Mahdi Abdulrahman (CPSO#: 107832)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2015 to 08 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017