Kankam, Kwaku (CPSO#: 30402)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1988