Kannu, Peter (CPSO#: 90328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:University of Otago, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5340
Fax: (416) 813-5345
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Peter Kannu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Kannu holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Kannu no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.