Kantoch, Michal Jerzy (CPSO#: 63433)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1991 to 30 Jan 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2009