Kanungo, Tarit Kumar (CPSO#: 63192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health Centre
180 Vine Street
Suite 105
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 682-7555
Fax: (905) 682-7446
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanungo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kanungo ( CPSO# 63192 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Centre
Suite 105
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 682-7555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARIT KUMAR KANUNGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANUNGO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1990