Kanwal, Tejpreet Kaur (CPSO#: 83418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
490 Bramalea Road
Suite 204
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone: (905) 230-3012
Fax: (905) 230-3017
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

peel memorial hospital
20 lynch street
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tejpreet Kanwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kanwal ( CPSO# 83418 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
490 Bramalea Road
Suite 103
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 230-3012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEJPREET KAUR KANWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008