Kao, Elizabeth Yuet Har (CPSO#: 66443)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Jan 1998