Kao, John Te Shao (CPSO#: 65275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boxgrove Medical Arts Centre
Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 471-5633
Fax: (905) 471-5634
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JTS Kao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kao ( CPSO# 65275 )

Business Address:
300 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-5633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TE SHAO KAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993