Kao, Raymond Liang-Chiyu (CPSO#: 62541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC-Victoria Campus
Division of Critical Care
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55662
Fax: (519) 667-6698
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND LIANG-CHIYU KAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991