Kao, Shawn Shu-Kang (CPSO#: 58249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Finchgate Medical Centre
Suite 102
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone: (905) 791-6444
Fax: (905) 791-7333
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 208
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 748-3939
Fax: (416) 748-7030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN SHU-KANG KAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988