Kapasi, Mustafa Shabbir (CPSO#: 98218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUSTAFA SHABBIR KAPASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2016 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2017 to 21 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2018

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)