Kapijimpanga, Lowesha Bedgers (CPSO#: 26362)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2013