Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kaplan, Allan Saul (CPSO#: 30745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
Room 806
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34980
Fax: (416) 979-6834
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN SAUL KAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979