Kaplan, David Michael (CPSO#: 76441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 494-7396
Fax: (416) 494-0129
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6826
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kaplan ( CPSO# 76441 )

Business Address:
Suite 703
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 494-7396

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL KAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2003