Kaplan, Henry Daniel (CPSO#: 58523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
89 Humber College Boulevard
Rexdale ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-1617
Fax: (416) 746-1619
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY DANIEL KAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992