Kaplan-Myrth, Nili (CPSO#: 88438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 Fourth Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S 2L3
Phone: (613) 695-6687
Fax: (613) 695-6689
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Kaplan-Myrth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaplan-Myrth ( CPSO# 88438 )

Business Address:
109 Fourth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 2L3
Phone Number: (613) 695-6687

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILI KAPLAN-MYRTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN-MYRTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011