Kaplansky-Gold, Cathy Susan (CPSO#: 56991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHY SUSAN KAPLANSKY-GOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLANSKY-GOLD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988