Kapoor, Anil (CPSO#: 64125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery - G340
McMaster University
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-6536
Fax: (905) 521-6195
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kapoor ( CPSO# 64125 )

Business Address:
Department of Surgery
St. Joseph's Hospital
G340 - 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6536

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1999