Kapoor, Pankaj Vimal (CPSO#: 86745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mysore University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue, suite 366
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 973-1133
Fax: (519) 973-1255
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

264 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 7052543312
Fax: 7054506459
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

264 McNabb Street, Main Floor
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 254-3312
Fax: (705) 450-6459
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Leamington Sleep Clinic
33 Princess Street
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 325-1333
Fax: (519) 325-1338
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kapoor ( CPSO# 86745 )

Business Address:
366 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 2Z2
Phone Number: (519) 973-1133

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 12 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Pankaj Vimal Kapoor may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.