Kapral, Moira Kassia (CPSO#: 65328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
14 E N - 215
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4642
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juurlink and Kapral Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2017

Dr. M. Kapral ( CPSO# 65328 )
Dr. D. Juurlink ( CPSO# 69280 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 14EN-215
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4642

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite g-106
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-3039

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MOIRA KASSIA KAPRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993