Kapur, Atul Kumar (CPSO#: 64919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atul Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kapur ( CPSO# 64919 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Site
Emergency Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8136

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8136

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATUL KUMAR KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992