Kapur, Nishtha (CPSO#: 70507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridlewood Mall
Suite 241
2900 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8
Phone: (416) 497-7277
Fax: (416) 497-7276
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kapur ( CPSO# 62540 )
Dr. N. Kapur ( CPSO# 70507 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6084

Business Address:
Bridlewood Mall
Suite 241
2900 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 497-7277

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHTHA KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998