Kapur, Prem Lal (CPSO#: 18973)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prem Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2006