Kapur, Shitij (CPSO#: 65718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dean's Office, Faculty of Medicine
Alan Gilbert Building, Carlton,
Melbourne, 3002
Australia
Melbourne 3002
Australia
Phone: +61 3 8344 589

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHITIJ KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1994