Kapur, Suneil (CPSO#: 75763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 422-3861
Fax: (613) 422-7538
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suneil Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kapur ( CPSO# 75763 )

Business Address:
203 - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 422-3861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNEIL KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003