Kara, Zulfikar Shamshudin (CPSO#: 63513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay College Medical and
Lockwood Diagnostics
Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 929-1900
Fax: (416) 929-7316
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Z. Kara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kara ( CPSO# 63513 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 929-1900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZULFIKAR SHAMSHUDIN KARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992