Karachi, Timothy Adem (CPSO#: 71107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Mailbox 87
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Karachi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Karachi ( CPSO# 71107 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Mailbox 87 Room A3-64
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 719-3334

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 715-3334

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 719-3334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ADEM KARACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARACHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003