Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Karaguesian, Gregory John (CPSO#: 62183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Hospital
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1392
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Francis Memorial hospital
7 st.francis memorial drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1X0
Canada
Phone: 613 756 3045
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Karaguesian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Karaguesian ( CPSO# 62183 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Hospital
Haliburton Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Business Address:
Haliburton Hospital
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1392

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Street
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN KARAGUESIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAGUESIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991