Karah, Munia Mahmoud Abdelmajeed (CPSO#: 81184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karah ( CPSO# 81184 )
Dr. A. Algird ( CPSO# 76882 )

Business Address:
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Suite 715
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNIA MAHMOUD ABDELMAJEED KARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 21 Jan 2005
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011