Karam, Rana (CPSO#: 79610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3409
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rana Karam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Karam ( CPSO# 79610 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANA KARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004