Karambolova, Kristi Konstantinova (CPSO#: 55249)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French, Macedonian, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Karambolova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 38006, 550 Eglinton Avenue West, Castlewood, Toronto, ON, M5N 1B0
Date Received: 21 May 2015


Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 05 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015