Karamchandani, Jason Raj Paul (CPSO#: 95863)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Stanford University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Bond Street Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016