Karanicolas, Stavros (CPSO#: 28828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6239
Fax: (416) 530-6722
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stavros Karanicolas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karanicolas ( CPSO# 28828 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6239

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STAVROS KARANICOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANICOLAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1976