Karas, Yair (CPSO#: 27261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Sep 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Sep 2006 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 20, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Yair Karas::

                  Dr. Karas may not perform Radial Keratotomy in his practice, pursuant to
                  a voluntary  Undertaking with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                  Ontario.