Karashi, Ali Redha Murtadha Ghuloom Noshad (CPSO#: 92134)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011