Karbi, Oscar Asher (CPSO#: 56791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50087
Fax: (905) 494-6571
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSCAR ASHER KARBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987