Kargbo, Natalia Vladimirovna (CPSO#: 88121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:International University of the Health S, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Millstream Drive
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 6L7
Phone: (705) 256-7141
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalia Kargbo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kargbo ( CPSO# 88121 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIA VLADIMIROVNA KARGBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2011