Karim, Jehan Noorbanu (CPSO#: 104810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics
& Gynecology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEHAN NOORBANU KARIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KARIM is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KARIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KARIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KARIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KARIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KARIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018